Print

    编语:下面试题是根据速算与巧算题型的变化总结出来的,非常适合六年级的同学参考练习,希望对大家有所帮助!

    1.  8372-4139+1628=    5382-600+599=  5436-(136+857)=   8579-873-127=

  2.  1+3+ 5+7+9+11+13+15+17=     8+10+…+24=

  3. 9999+999+99+9=

  4.  (2+4+6+…+2006)-(1+3+5+…+2005)= 5.  (1+3+5+…+1999)-(2+4+6+…+1998)=

  1. 8372-4139+1628=     5382-600+599=   5436-(136+857)=   8579-873-127=

  2.  1+3+ 5+7+9+11+13+15+17=       6+8+10+…+24=

  4. 9999+999+99+9=

  4.  (2+4+6+…+2006)-(1+3+5+…+2005)=

  5.  (1+3+5+…+1999)-(2+4+6+…+1998)=

  ①536+(541+464)+459           ② 588+264+148 

  ③ 8996+3458+7546              ④567+558+562+555+563

  ① 1870-280-520                      ② 4995-(995-480) 

  ③ 4250-294+94                      ④ 1272-995

  ① 478-128+122-72                    ② 464-545+99+345 

  ③ 537-(543-163)-57                 ④ 947+(372-447)-572

  ①23×1010101             ②4568×100010001

  ③72×125                 ④45×99              ⑤75×36

  ①536+(541+464)+459           ② 588+264+148 

  ③ 8996+3458+7546              ④567+558+562+555+563

  ① 1870-280-520                      ② 4995-(995-480) 

  ③ 4250-294+94                      ④ 1272-995

  ① 478-128+122-72                    ② 464-545+99+345 

  ③ 537-(543-163)-57                 ④ 947+(372-447)-572[!--empirenews.page--]

  ①23×1010101             ②4568×100010001

  ③72×125                 ④45×99              ⑤75×36

  ①77×83                 ②56×64

  ③134×73                ④9×11×101

  ①536+(541+464)+459           ② 588+264+148 

  ③ 8996+3458+7546              ④567+558+562+555+563

  ① 1870-280-520                      ② 4995-(995-480) 

  ③ 4250-294+94                      ④ 1272-995

  ① 478-128+122-72                    ② 464-545+99+345 

  ③ 537-(543-163)-57                 ④ 947+(372-447)-572

  ①23×1010101             ②4568×100010001

  ③72×125                 ④45×99              ⑤75×36

  ①77×83                 ②56×64

  ③134×73                ④9×11×101

  6. 计算:9×17+91&pide;17-5×17+45&pide;17.